+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Refuses to Recede
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Senate Requests House Recede
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senators Zirkin, Hough, and Ready
- Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary, and Malone
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 332611/1 Report Adopted
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-1)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 838378/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-103 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2019: House - Committee - Judiciary
April 3, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
April 2, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135