+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (42-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-1)
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 530713/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-1)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 214334/1 Report Adopted
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On October 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-801 through 3-803 - Article - Agriculture
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 30, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 42
March 28, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 1
February 11, 2019: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor