+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Plain Language Requirement
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {404836/1 Adopted
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Election Law - Petitions and Ballot Questions - Plain Language Requirement
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On September 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 6-103, 6-201, 7-103 - Article - Election Law
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
January 15, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor