+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendment
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {406085/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {407271/1 Report Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 28, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
February 29, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor