+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 21, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor