+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {979532/1 Report Adopted
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
979532/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-304 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2015: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 29, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 18, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 16, 2015: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor