+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 904539/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On November 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
904539/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-957 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2018: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 21, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
January 16, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
January 12, 2018: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor