+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
- Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 50
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- Overridden (93-44)
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Overridden (30-16)
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Veto Letter
- Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (91-42)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
- Referred Judiciary
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (31-15)
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {683322/1 Adopted
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {683322/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 3-8A-14, 3-8A-14.2 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
- 2-108, 2-405 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2022: Overridden (30-16)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 16
April 9, 2022: Overridden (93-44)
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 44
March 31, 2022: Third Reading Passed (91-42)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 42
March 17, 2022: Third Reading Passed (31-15)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 15