+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
- Hearing canceled
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations and Economic Matters
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {537274/1 Report Adopted
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
537274/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 5, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor