+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Peters) Adopted
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {574436/1 Report Adopted
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
574436/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 23, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46