+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-101 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
April 3, 2015: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 10, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor