+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 268477/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
268477/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2018: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 18, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45