+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 172113/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
172113/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2019: House - Committee - Judiciary
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 28, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 4, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor