+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-104 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 1, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 18, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor