+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {739232/1 Report Adopted
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Budget and Taxation
- Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
739232/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2017: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 27, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 27, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor