+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Passed Enrolled
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Requests House Recede
- Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
- Senators Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Salling
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- House Refuses to Recede
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates A. Washington, Shoemaker, and Ebersole
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {535564/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {864533/1 Report Adopted
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
April 4, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
April 2, 2015: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor