+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {699630/1 Report Adopted
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
699630/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-721 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2015: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 27, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor