+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Referred Health and Government Operations
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted
- Text - Third - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
- Second Reading Passed
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
- First Reading Finance
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-7A-01 through 13-7A-04, 13-7A-05, 13-7A-06, 13-7A-07 through 13-7A-09 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2020: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
March 10, 2020: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47