+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
- Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (135-0)
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-207 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 5, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 2, 2019: House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
- Yeas: 135
April 2, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor