+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {943123/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
- Floor Amendment {843621/2 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {437871/1
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {437871/1
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {437871/1
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
- First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 6, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 6, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor