+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
On April 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 305166/1 Report Adopted
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 764432/1 Report Adopted
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2018: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 4, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
April 1, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
February 23, 2018: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor