+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {909738/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/07 at 9:00 a.m.
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
909738/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 29, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
February 27, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 25, 2013: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor