+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (122-16)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-3)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 707479/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m.
On October 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
707479/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2019: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 24, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 122
- Nays: 16
March 15, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor