+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred Appropriations
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (32-14)
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Funding Formulas – Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Committee Amendment {693225/1 Adopted
- Favorable Adopted
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Text - First - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Funding Formulas – Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-205 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2022: Third Reading Passed (32-14)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 14
January 27, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor