+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {790111/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {879931/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 10A-401 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 5, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
April 5, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 19, 2015: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 19, 2015: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor