+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Health and Government Operations
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health – Children With Mental Disorders – List of Available Services
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {407974/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Behavioral Health Administration - Children With Mental Disorders - List of Available Services
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-908 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2020: Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Yeas: 44