+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-4)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {879934/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
- Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
879934/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-802 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 2, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 4
March 11, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 9, 2015: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor