+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health – Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories in Frederick County
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 263
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-1)
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 15, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Referred Health and Government Operations
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health – Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories in Frederick County
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {847773/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 17-701 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (132-1)
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 1
March 14, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 13, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 4, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor