+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 755
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (31-14)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (95-41)
- Floor Amendment 363923/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (40-96)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 625360/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (33-14)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 984134/1 Report Adopted
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 984134/1
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-302 - Article - Election Law
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 27, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 14
March 21, 2019: House Floor - Floor Amendment {363923/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 96
March 21, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 41
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor