+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Recede
- Third Reading Passed (106-27)
- Motion Recede (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Klausmeier and Hershey)
- Senate Requests House Recede
- Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Klausmeier and Hershey)
- Senate Requests House Recede
- Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {533093/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {293229/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (38-94)
- Third Reading Passed (92-38)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Referred Economic Matters
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-1)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {317078/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 8, 2021: Third Reading Passed (106-27)
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 27
March 30, 2021: Floor Amendment {293229/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (38-94)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 94
March 30, 2021: Third Reading Passed (92-38)
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 38
March 18, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-1)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
March 17, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
January 24, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor