+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 458
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {460713/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Environment and Transportation
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Application of Tidal Wetlands Permit Requirements to Aquaculture Operations - Study
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {484139/1 Adopted
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Aquaculture Leases and Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 16-101, 16-104, 16-202, 16-304 - Article - Environment
- 4-11A-09, 4-11A-10, 4-11A-23 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
April 5, 2021: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- Yeas: 135
March 2, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
January 22, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor