+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-1)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {158471/1 Report Adopted
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
158471/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-204 - Article - Correctional Services
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2013: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 26, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 1
March 14, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46