+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Commission to Study the Health Care Workforce Crisis in Maryland - Establishment
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 708
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Commission to Study the Health Care Workforce Crisis in Maryland - Establishment
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (129-1)
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {743325/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Referred Health and Government Operations
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Commission to Study the Health Care Workforce Crisis in Maryland - Establishment
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {243320/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Commission to Study the Health Care Workforce Crisis in Maryland - Establishment
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
April 4, 2022: Third Reading Passed (129-1)
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 1
March 3, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
February 3, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor