+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate Simmons) Adopted
- Favorable
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {919030/1 Report Adopted
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
919030/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2013: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 31, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 21, 2013: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 21, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor