+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {649634/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
649634/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 29, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
February 26, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 24, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor