+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 567978/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
567978/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-831 - Article - Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2019: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 24, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 18, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 16, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46