+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (129-3)
- Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Patterson) Adopted (125-2)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {395168/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing canceled
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
- Referred Ways and Means
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Gaming - Sports Betting - Implementation
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {533523/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
- Favorable with Amendments {489239/1 Adopted
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {489239/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Gaming - Sports Betting - Implementation
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-1A-01, 9-1A-03, 9-1A-30, 9-1A-33, 9-1E-01 through 9-1E-14 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (6)
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 17, 2020: Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Patterson) Adopted (125-2)
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 2
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (129-3)
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 3
March 10, 2020: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47