+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (113-28)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {657275/1 Report Adopted
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
657275/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-309 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
February 25, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 22, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
February 22, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor