+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Economic Matters
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Statute Amended
- 22-102, 22-1402 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2020: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
February 5, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Harford County Senators
Type:
Primary Sponsor