+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On April 3, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred Judiciary
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {703321/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-526 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (131-0)
- Yeas: 131
March 17, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 16, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
January 10, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor