+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (115-20)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-3)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 549937/1 Report Adopted
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
549937/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 23, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 20
March 17, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 3
March 15, 2018: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor