+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-1)
- Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (134-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-1)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
- Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {754732/2 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
754732/02
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 18-14A-04 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 7, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
April 4, 2016: House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Kaiser) Adopted
- Yeas: 134
April 4, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 1
April 2, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
President
Type:
Primary Sponsor