+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Special Education - Individualized Education Programs - Educational Evaluations
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Special Education - Individualized Education Programs - Educational Evaluations
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {404438/1 Adopted
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Special Education - Individualized Education Programs - Educational Evaluations
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-405 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2021: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
March 16, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 9, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
January 21, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor