+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {175466/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On January 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On October 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
175466/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-906 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 1, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 1
January 30, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
January 27, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
Type:
Primary Sponsor