+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (115-22)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {129038/1 Report Adopted
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
129038/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 23-215.1 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2015: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 28, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 22
March 11, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 9, 2015: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor