+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {327971/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
327971/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2013: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 3, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 22, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 21, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor