+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 690612/1 Report Adopted
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
690612/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
April 2, 2018: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 29, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
February 12, 2018: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor