+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (40-6)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0)
- Floor Committee Amendment 836288/1 Adopted
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (40-6)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment 843125/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 717674/1 Report Adopted
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 717674/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 4-328 - Article - General Provisions
- 1-301 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-303 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-304 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-306 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-307 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-308 through 1-311 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-312 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-308 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-309 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-310 - Article - Public Safety
- 1-311 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (4)
March 23, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 6
March 21, 2019: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 18, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments
- Yeas: 129
March 1, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor