+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {653123/1 Adopted
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments {943599/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {704232/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-204.1 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2015: House - Committee - Economic Matters
April 2, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments
- Yeas: 140
April 2, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor