+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {849936/1 Adopted
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Text - First - Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-1A-01, 9-1A-26, 9-1A-27 - Article - State Government
+ − Vote
March 15, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor